Accounts and annual returns EDMUND MACK

Charity number: 242330
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 10 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 25 August 2019 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required