Accounts and annual returns THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS (GREAT BRITAIN)

Charity number: 242451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 21 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 29 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2016 31 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 October 2017 On time Download Open in new window