Financial history THE CHURCH OF JESUS CHRIST OF LATTER-DAY SAINTS (GREAT BRITAIN)

Charity number: 242451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £39.36m £47.13m £147.46m £38.15m £49.76m
Total expenditure £48.86m £51.06m £153.58m £48.74m £51.71m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £45.38m £140.66m £37.04m £49.20m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.02m £1.04m £1.07m £280.00k £312.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £2.44m £0 £0
Income - Other £38.34m £712.00k £3.30m £825.00k £245.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £48.23m £50.91m £152.70m £43.94m £51.28m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £705.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £50.00k £54.00k £52.00k £53.00k £50.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £705.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £630.00k £149.00k £179.00k £4.80m £430.00k