Trustees UNITED SYNAGOGUE
Charity number: 242552

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL HOWARD GOLDSTEIN | Chair | 10 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Simon Anthony Mitchell | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Tristan Howard Nagler | Trustee | 17 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Rachel Irma Hartog | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Jacqueline Malca Zinkin | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Dr Nicola Abigail Rosenfelder | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Maxwell John Nisner | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||
Saul David Taylor | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
FLEURISE LUDER | Trustee | 10 July 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||
Claire Lemer | Trustee | 14 July 2014 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.