Accounts and annual returns THE LEICESTER AND LEICESTERSHIRE ANIMAL AID ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 242560
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 July 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 24 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 06 July 2018 On time Download Open in new window