Financial history GWENT WILDLIFE TRUST LTD

Charity number: 242619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £928.01k £3.33m £763.73k £984.26k £921.74k
Total expenditure £1.00m £1.24m £1.12m £1.17m £1.29m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £516.42k £269.70k £278.35k £480.36k £512.61k
Income - Donations and legacies £306.31k £2.93m £274.03k £324.98k £314.81k
Income - Other trading activities £53.39k £57.27k £108.85k £79.57k £23.42k
Income - Charitable activities £542.76k £311.74k £328.48k £535.15k £558.91k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £25.55k £34.72k £52.37k £44.56k £24.60k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £9.67k £2.68m £16.84k £47.52k £1.97k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £871.89k £1.08m £977.11k £1.04m £1.16m
Expenditure - Raising funds £130.72k £128.72k £144.22k £129.74k £132.95k
Expenditure - Governance £54.80k £126.38k £36.53k £36.13k £36.19k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £32.48k £0 £0 £0