WEBB'S HOME TRUST

Charity number: 204665-70
Removed charity
Governing document
DEED DATED 27 JULY 1898 AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 FEBRUARY 1899, SCHEMES OF 25 JULY 1958 AND 5 AUGUST 1983
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS RESIDING IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL
Area of benefit
BRISTOL.
Registration history
  • 13 February 1962: Standard registration
  • 10 October 2005: Removed (Amalgamated)
  • 10 October 2005: Funds transferred to 1109141-16 BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES' RELIEF IN NEED CHARIT...
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of