OLD FARNLEY AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 242846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £29.35k £17.20k £15.66k £18.03k £17.23k
Total expenditure £28.78k £17.42k £16.11k £16.97k £15.12k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £13.22k £500 £0 N/A £200