BURY ST EDMUNDS THEATRE MANAGEMENT LIMITED

Charity number: 242977
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 05 February 2021 5 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 12 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 14 March 2019 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 14 March 2019 42 days late Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 28 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 28 December 2016 On time Download