BURY ST EDMUNDS THEATRE MANAGEMENT LIMITED

Charity number: 242977
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.62m £1.75m £1.94m £2.01m £2.24m
Total expenditure £1.66m £1.75m £1.89m £2.07m £2.13m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £211.25k £186.25k £165.25k £186.08k £161.25k
Income - Donations and legacies £389.07k £487.41k £450.45k £367.00k £468.46k
Income - Other trading activities £250.99k £252.05k £254.43k £348.30k £336.89k
Income - Charitable activities £902.44k £969.01k £1.17m £1.29m £1.37m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £154 £527 £1.67k £4.24k £4.97k
Income - Other £78.54k £40.04k £60.70k £0 £55.65k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.45m £1.55m £1.69m £1.86m £1.92m
Expenditure - Raising funds £208.34k £200.53k £201.44k £214.44k £209.78k
Expenditure - Governance £14.34k £16.83k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0