Trustees BURY ST EDMUNDS THEATRE MANAGEMENT LIMITED
Charity number: 242977
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER QUINCE | Chair | 15 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Jeanette Howlett | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Dr Matthew Thomas Piccaver | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Michie | Trustee | 25 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sara Whybrew | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Elizabeth Fisher | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Graeme Donald Kirk | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Bryan Paul Littlefair | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Codrington-Fernandez | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.