LINCOLNSHIRE Y.M.C.A. LTD

Charity number: 243017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Whittaker Trustee 23 September 2013 None on record
Chris Burke Trustee 31 May 2018 None on record
Sally Melbourne Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record
GRAHAM BRATBY Trustee 22 September 1995
THE SKILLS TRAINING & GROWTH ACADEMY Received: On time
NATIONAL COUNCIL OF YOUNG MEN'S CHRISTIAN ASSOCIATIONS (INCORPORATED) Received: On time
LINCOLNSHIRE EMPLOYMENT ACCOMMODATION PROJECT LIMITED Received: On time
JOHN LATHAM Trustee 26 September 2016 None on record
Beth Curtis Trustee 30 March 2015 None on record
Richard Mair Trustee 27 April 2015 None on record
Margaret Botterill Trustee 22 December 2011 None on record
IAN SACKREE Chair 22 September 2010 None on record
Prof Nigel Curry Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record
John Henwood Trustee 02 December 2019 None on record