Accounts and annual returns WEST DORSET MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 243100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 31 July 2020 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 20 January 2021 174 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2018 25 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 25 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2017 19 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 06 September 2018 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2016 18 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 20 April 2017 On time Download Open in new window