Financial history WEST DORSET MENCAP SOCIETY

Charity number: 243100
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £106.04k £121.21k £129.77k £132.63k £101.60k
Total expenditure £97.89k £94.72k £140.40k £125.64k £112.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £24.00k