CONNAHS QUAY OLD PEOPLES' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 243148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 03 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 29 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 21 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required