BARTON TURF CHARITY FOR RELIEF IN NEED

Charity number: 243197
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.15k £1.94k £4.88k £8.27k £4.38k
Total expenditure £4.27k £3.70k £4.01k £3.86k £3.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A