Accounts and annual returns VILLIER'S RENTCHARGES

Charity number: 243209
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 February 2022 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 November 2020 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 March 2020 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 08 December 2018 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required