COOK'S BETHEL OTHERWISE SEAMAN'S BETHEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunday meetings for preaching, teaching, worship, prayer: Coffee mornings provide instruction, support, fellowship: Support groups - drug & alcohol rehabilitation, mental health, veterans, other support groups as requested. Evening meetings provide teaching, encouragement, support, and fellowship: Support to the community: Operational base for Street pastors evening patrols, Place of Welcome.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 20 September 1965: Standard registration
- THE WATERSIDE COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- COOK'S BETHEL OTHERWISE SEAMEN'S BETHAL (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Thomas | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Baird | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Darren Beavon | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Allott-Butler | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Baird | Trustee | 27 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Townend | Trustee | 03 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.00k | £23.45k | £38.21k | £19.19k | £24.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.23k | £6.40k | £28.39k | £10.12k | £7.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.78k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 31 AUGUST 1906, 6 FEBRUARY 1914 AND 8 MAY 1962
Charitable objects
THE MEETING HOUSE BETHEL OR PREACHING ROOM TO BE DEVOTED TO THE INSTRUCTION OF SEAMEN AND THE POOR ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUDING NONE.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF ALVERSTOKE.
Linked charities
- 20 September 1965 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Henry Cook Centre
South Street
GOSPORT
Hampshire
PO12 1ES
- Phone:
- 02392 178171
- Email:
- admin@thehenrycookcentre.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window