WYTHALL COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 243332
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

32 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Antony Robert Rand Trustee 14 September 2020 None on record
Madeline Evans Trustee 01 February 2020 None on record
Barry Knee Trustee 26 October 2016 None on record
MRS JILL DYER MBE Trustee
WYTHALL COMMUNITY HALL TRUST Received: On time
ALAN GRAHAME GRIFFIN Trustee None on record
MARK STINTON Trustee None on record
STUART IAN HOWARTH Trustee None on record
Christine Mary Stokes Trustee 27 February 2014 None on record
PHIL RICHARDSON Trustee None on record
ROY CLARKE Trustee 04 June 2018
1ST TIDBURY GREEN (WYTHALL) SCOUT GROUP Received: 6 days late
BEVERLEY GEORGE THOMPSON Trustee 31 March 2020 None on record
Charlotte Monica Quirk Trustee 25 September 2020 None on record
RICHARD BURN Trustee 03 June 2016
THE WYTHALL AND HOLLYWOOD 10K, 5K AND 1.5K FUN RUN Received: On time
Brian William Brittle Trustee 27 February 2014 None on record
HOWARD CLIVE KNOWLES Trustee None on record
MR GEOFF DENARO Trustee
WYTHALL COMMUNITY HALL TRUST Received: On time
BARRIE STOKES Trustee None on record
SUSAN JANE BAXTER Chair
WYTHALL COMMUNITY HALL TRUST Received: On time
MAVIS NEALE Trustee None on record
ELIZABETH ANNE JOHNSON Trustee None on record
DESMOND L ASHBY Trustee None on record
Kevin Michael Turner Trustee 12 March 2021 None on record
KEITH YATES Trustee 05 August 2018 None on record
Nicholas Bridgens Trustee 27 February 2014 None on record
JOHN ATTWOOD Trustee 23 November 2015 None on record
MR LES TURNER Trustee None on record
MALCOLM BARRIE JONES Trustee
WYTHALL COMMUNITY HALL TRUST Received: On time
Sarah Hession Trustee 19 April 2017 None on record
Richard Harris Trustee 27 February 2014 None on record
JAMES MANN Trustee None on record
KEN BYNG Trustee 04 May 2018 None on record
HELEN ANNE CLEAVER Trustee None on record