ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BUCKINGHAMSHIRE SOUTH BRANCH

Charity number: 243352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £237.39k £252.70k £293.01k £268.17k £238.83k
Total expenditure £214.51k £192.78k £209.09k £267.22k £295.15k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £69.01k