ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS BUCKINGHAMSHIRE SOUTH BRANCH

Charity number: 243352
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helen Kay Barnard Trustee 26 October 2020
CHESS VALLEY UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE Received: On time
Valerie Angela Brickell Trustee 01 June 2020 None on record
Steven John Edwards Trustee 09 August 2021 None on record
Elaine Janice King Trustee 22 February 2021 None on record
Helen Elizabeth Brownridge Trustee 09 August 2021 None on record
Jeremy Stuart Dandridge Trustee 09 August 2021 None on record
Lynne Nicola Warren Trustee 26 April 2021 None on record
Jane Christina Chaney Trustee 09 August 2021 None on record
Stephanie Helen Okell Trustee 22 February 2021 None on record
Ian Mash Trustee 09 August 2021 None on record