THE PENSION CHARITIES OF TIMOTHY DEAN AND JANE DEAN

Charity number: 243388
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide relief to elderly/disabled/groups of people who are in the Chester area and need financial assistance to serve others and to relieve poverty.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 27 February 2024

Total income: £6,100
Total expenditure: £10,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Cheshire East
  • Cheshire West & Chester
  • Knowsley
  • Liverpool City
  • Sefton
  • St Helens
  • Wirral

Governance

Registration history:
  • 20 December 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SYLVIA ROSEMARY SPENCER Chair
None on record
Christopher Goacher Trustee 30 May 2023
None on record
SIMON ROGER LE RICHE ROWLANDS Trustee 25 August 1998
None on record
MARGARET ROSE MADDISON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 27/02/2020 27/02/2021 27/02/2022 27/02/2023 27/02/2024
Total gross income £3.08k £3.23k £5.02k £5.13k £6.10k
Total expenditure £3.00k £3.00k £0 £9.10k £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 27 February 2024 06 January 2025 10 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2024 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2023 13 August 2024 230 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2022 13 April 2023 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2021 04 March 2023 432 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 27 February 2020 04 March 2023 797 days late
Accounts and TAR 27 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 4 MAY 1937
Charitable objects
PAYMENT OF PENSIONS TO SIX POOR PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER, WHO FROM AGE,ILL - HEALTH, ACCIDENT OR INFIRMITY ARE WHOLLY OR IN PART UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES BY THEIR OWN EXERTIONS. FOUR OF THE PENSIONERS SHALL BE WOMEN OF THE PRESBYTERIAN PERSUASION AND TWO SHALL BE MEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 20 December 1965 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
63 Crogen
Chirk
WREXHAM
LL14 5BN
Phone:
01691778249