THE CHARITY OF THE REVD GEORGE WALLS, D D

Charity number: 243406
Charity reporting is overdue by 544 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 02 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 179 days
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 179 days
Annual return 02 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 544 days
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 544 days
Annual return 02 August 2018 15 January 2020 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 02 August 2017 09 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 02 August 2016 08 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 02 August 2016 Not Required