Accounts and annual returns MAHARASHTRA MANDAL LONDON

Charity number: 243443
Charity reporting is up to date (39 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 09 October 2023 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 09 October 2023 39 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 08 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 08 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 29 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 29 July 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 19 August 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2018 14 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 14 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window