Accounts and annual returns LOUGHTON MEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 243579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022

(These accounts
have been qualified)

11 August 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 25 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 25 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 September 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 18 September 2018 On time Download Open in new window