Financial history LOUGHTON MEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 243579
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £26.10k £29.57k £39.02k £10.14k £35.52k
Total expenditure £20.02k £36.56k £48.95k £16.13k £20.04k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A