Financial history British Microcirculation and Vascular Biology Society

Charity number: 243589
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £18.55k £12.18k £15.16k £8.22k £7.62k
Total expenditure £25.37k £21.20k £14.63k £9.48k £9.30k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A