ECCLESIASTICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 243676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.36k £7.97k £6.60k £6.70k £6.69k
Total expenditure £5.06k £1.44k £2.16k £5.44k £11.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A