HADLEY OLD PEOPLESREST ROOM COMMITTEE

Charity number: 243812
Charity reporting is overdue by 310 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £11.59k £8.26k £11.92k £12.82k £13.36k
Total expenditure £9.48k £10.21k £10.68k £11.71k £14.22k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £0 £2.99k £500