Accounts and annual returns RECREATION GROUND BENFLEET U D

Charity number: 243861
Charity reporting is overdue by 1598 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 137 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 502 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 502 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 867 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 867 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1232 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1232 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1598 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1598 days