LITTLE MELTON PAROCHIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is for the benefit of residents in the Parish of Little Melton, Norwich who are in conditions of need, hardship or distress by making grants of money or providing or paying for items, services or facilities calculated to reduce the need, hardship or distress of such persons.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Norfolk
Governance
- 19 August 1965: Standard registration
- POOR'S LAND (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TREVOR LESLIE BAKER | Chair | 28 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edward Mawby | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Lynn Marie Chapman | Trustee | 03 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Che Leverett | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Charles Plummer | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Peter Hedges | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JEAN FRANCES CHAMBERLAIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.03k | £9.70k | £9.38k | £8.19k | £27.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.33k | £5.84k | £7.47k | £18.47k | £7.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 23 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
P.R. VOL.29 P.747 INDENTURES OF LEASE AND RELEASE DATED 25TH MARCH 1891 SCHEME OF C C OF 1ST AUGUST 1995. null
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF LITTLE MELTON WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
LITTLE MELTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 School Lane
Little Melton
NR9 3AD
- Phone:
- 01603531086
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window