PENCARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides for those in need, by reason of youth, age, ill-health, disability or financial hardship, such beneficiaries being of the Jewish faith and living in the local Jewish community or with a significant connection to the local Jewish community. For the advancement of the Jewish faith the charity also makes grant to synagogues in the local Jewish community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 25 August 1965: Standard registration
- PENYLAN HOUSE, JEWISH RETIREMENT AND NURSING HOME (Previous name)
- SOUTH WALES, MONMOUTHSHIRE AND WEST OF ENGLAND JEWISH HOME FOR THE AGED (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH COTSEN JP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN MINKES | Trustee | 12 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
LYNICE CAWSTON | Trustee | 30 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
RUTH LEVENE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Philip David Stewart | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LAURENCE KAHN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr RALPH WHITTEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET WHITTEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £136.41k | £117.83k | £126.94k | £132.46k | £127.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.72k | £109.35k | £102.15k | £143.47k | £174.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24/03/1946 AS AMENDED ON 12/07/1988 AS AMENDED ON 14/01/2003 AS AMENDED ON 22/10/2006 AS AMENDED ON 12/12/2010 AS AMENDED ON 10/02/2013 AS AMENDED ON 02 OCT 2017 as amended on 09 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO: 1. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL- HEALTH, DISABILITY, OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, SUCH BENEFICIARIES BEING: A. AGED PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH LIVING IN THE LOCAL JEWISH COMMUNITY; B. OTHER PERSONS OF THE JEWISH FAITH LIVING IN THE LOCAL JEWISH COMMUNITY; C. OTHER PERSONS WITH A SIGNIFICANT CONNECTION TO THE LOCAL JEWISH COMMUNITY; D. OTHER PERSONS IN NEED; AND 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, INCLUDING BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS TO SYNAGOGUES IN THE LOCAL JEWISH COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 2526
CARDIFF
CF23 0GU
- Phone:
- 07748960195
- Email:
- penylan.mgmt@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window