ACKLETON VILLAGE HALL ALSO KNOWN AS ACKLETON MISSION ROOM 2. TRUST FUND IN CONNEXION WITH ACKLETON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 244010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 01 April 2021 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 08 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 09 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 03 May 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required