CHURCH ESTATE (INCLUDING THE CHARITY OF SIR WILLIAM BLACKETT THE YOUNGER)

Charity number: 244047
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £212.24k £215.91k £209.37k £218.60k £194.60k
Total expenditure £157.35k £203.37k £237.11k £168.07k £177.81k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A