BRITISH DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY

Charity number: 244450
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PROFESSOR Roger Mark Feakins Trustee 23 November 2018
BRITISH DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY CIO Recently registered
Dr Paul Craig Trustee 23 November 2018 None on record
DR Nicky D'Haene Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Dr STEFAN DOJCINOV Trustee 23 November 2018
BRITISH LYMPHOMA PATHOLOGY GROUP Received: On time
BRITISH DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY CIO Recently registered
Dr Jan von der Thusen Trustee 23 November 2018 None on record
Professor Simon Cross MD FRCPath Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
PROF CLAUDE CUVELIER Trustee None on record
Dr Mike Osborn Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Professor Mary Leader Chair 01 January 2017 None on record
Prof Alastair Burt Trustee 01 January 2020 None on record
PROFESSOR RAYMOND MCMAHON Trustee 01 December 2007 None on record
Dr Lisa Catherine Browning Trustee 23 November 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR ANDREW GORDON NICHOLSON Trustee 06 August 2012
BRITISH DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY CIO Recently registered
Dr Abhisek Ghosh Trustee 01 January 2020
BRITISH DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY CIO Recently registered
Dr Eduardo Calonje Trustee 23 November 2018
BRITISH DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY CIO Recently registered
Dr Katie Elizabeth McIntosh Trustee 24 April 2015
BRITISH DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY CIO Recently registered
Professor Kieran Sheahan Trustee 01 January 2017 None on record
Dr NAFISA WILKINSON Trustee 08 August 2012
BRITISH DIVISION OF THE INTERNATIONAL ACADEMY OF PATHOLOGY CIO Recently registered