HIGHLAND SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity number: 244472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £46.86k £45.19k £42.30k £54.19k £58.48k
Total expenditure £39.04k £44.32k £42.78k £47.37k £60.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A