Trustees CHICHESTER MEDICAL EDUCATION CENTRE
Charity number: 244559
Charity reporting is overdue by 93 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL HART | Trustee | 27 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michael Carruthers Johnstone | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA RIGBY | Trustee | 12 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hatef Mansoubi | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Guy Jonathan Charles Harris | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr Neal Robert Gent | Trustee | 12 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOHN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2001 |
|
|
||||
Dr GRAEME DEWHURST | Trustee | 19 March 1991 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.