Leadenham Inclosure Award Charity

Charity number: 244600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Maintenance of the Church and relief of the poor in Leadenham, Lincolnshire, includes projects which aid the community in Leadenham whether religious or secular

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,940
Total expenditure: £2,800

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 1965: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHARITY KNOWN AS THE CHURCH GRASS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Henrietta Mary Louise Reeve Chair 14 August 2013
LINCOLN CATHEDRAL MUSIC FUND
Received: On time
Julie Marie Stevenson Trustee 24 April 2022
None on record
DAPHNE MILDRED PAGE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.94k £5.94k £5.94k £5.94k £5.94k
Total expenditure £2.85k £2.85k £2.85k £2.85k £2.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 03 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 15 November 2021 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 November 2020 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
High House
Rectory Lane
Leadenham
Lincoln
LN5 0PT
Phone:
07889540605
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available