Accounts and annual returns THE ADA HOMEWOOD FUND FOR FEEDING STARVING CHILDREN

Charity number: 244988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 24 January 2022 13 April 2023 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 24 January 2021 25 November 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 24 January 2020 27 November 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 24 January 2019 14 January 2020 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 24 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 24 January 2018 05 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 24 January 2018 Not Required