Financial history THE ADA HOMEWOOD FUND FOR FEEDING STARVING CHILDREN

Charity number: 244988
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 24/01/2018 24/01/2019 24/01/2020 24/01/2021 24/01/2022
Total gross income £5.63k £3.82k £264 £4.62k £5.38k
Total expenditure £7.09k £5.86k £3.94k £5.03k £6.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A