DOLANOG RESIDENTIAL HOME

Charity number: 245425
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £625.61k £654.10k £632.96k £710.99k £776.59k
Total expenditure £643.50k £797.69k £747.58k £738.05k £770.72k
Income from government contracts £228.76k £248.70k £286.88k £297.66k £328.01k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £43.52k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £625.59k £654.10k £632.95k £691.47k £734.85k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £17 £6 £8 £2 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £19.51k £41.75k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £643.50k £797.69k £747.58k £738.05k £770.72k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £28.28k £26.74k £27.48k £26.65k £11.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0