WEST BERKSHIRE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 246183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £46.26k £63.21k £75.25k £74.14k £149.18k
Total expenditure £105.92k £88.90k £66.20k £115.51k £179.36k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A