WEST BERKSHIRE COMMUNITY HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS

Charity number: 246183
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Shindler Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Helen Olivia Whitley Trustee 16 July 2014 None on record
JACKIE FLYNN Trustee 30 December 2012 None on record
Mary Cross Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
Lindsey Stephens Trustee 13 September 2016 None on record
Jean Lyle Trustee 17 September 2019 None on record
SYLVIA MARGARET GALBRAITH Trustee None on record
Emma Stephens Trustee 03 November 2020 None on record
DIANE NORMAN Trustee None on record
Patricia Arrowsmith Trustee 15 July 2015 None on record
MRS ANNE BENNETT JP Trustee None on record
CHRIS BYNG Trustee
THE SHAW-CUM-DONNINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
MRS KATE MAYO Trustee None on record
STUART STEPHENS Chair
THE SHAW-CUM-DONNINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Lynn Daulby Trustee 15 July 2015 None on record
ANN ISAACS Trustee None on record