LICHFIELD AND BILSTON DRILL HALLS TRUST FUND

Charity number: 246189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Managing Trustees make grants, at their discretion, to selected TA Units based within the County of Stafford (including those Units in the geographical area of the former County of Stafford) and the Staffordshire Army Cadets Force for such charitable purposes as are calculated to further their miliotary efficiency by improving the facilities and amenities of training and service.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £15,624
Total expenditure: £9,981

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Staffordshire
  • Stoke-on-trent City
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 January 1965: Standard registration
  • 16 April 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 16 April 2015: Funds transferred to
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BILSTON AND LICHFIELD DRILL HALLS TRUST FUND (Working name)
  • BILSTON DRILL HALL TRUST FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLONEL TDC LLOYD OBE, TD, DL Chair
None on record
COLONEL Richard Lewis Maybery Trustee 13 December 2017
YOUTH ORGANISATIONS IN UNIFORM WEST MIDLANDS CIO
Received: On time
STEPHEN WRIGHT Trustee 18 February 2016
None on record
STUART GAVIN MOUNTFORD Trustee 05 March 2013
None on record
MAJOR D HARRIS TD Trustee
KINGSWOOD TRUST
Received: On time
COLONEL CE COMPORT OBE, TD, DL Trustee
ROYAL ARTILLERY CHARITABLE FUND
Received: On time
MAJOR PC MULINGANI Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £12.39k £10.85k £10.74k £44.04k £15.62k
Total expenditure £13.20k £11.33k £11.39k £9.04k £9.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 24 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 24 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 15 MAY 1972 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 14 DECEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE USED IN MAKING GRANTS TO ANY OF THE EXISTING UNITS (WHICH ARE: B COMPANY 2ND BATTALION MERCIAN VOLUNTEERS, TERRITORIAL ARMY AND HEADQUARTERS COMPANY AND C (STAFFORDSHIRE) COMPANY 1ST BATTALION MERCIAN VOLUNTEERS, TERRITORIAL ARMY;) FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE CALCULATED TO FURTHER THEIR MILITARY EFFICIENCY BY IMPROVING THE FACILITIES AND AMENITIES OF TRAINING AND SERVICE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 03 January 1965 : Standard registration
  • 16 April 2015 : Removed
  • 16 April 2015 : Asset transfer out

Contact information

Address:
W M R F C A
TENNAL GRANGE
TENNAL ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B32 2HX
Phone:
01214275221
Website:

No information available