Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS HALL, GOOCH STREET, RECREATION GROUND TRUST

Charity number: 246233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 06 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 November 2020 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 12 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required