Financial history THE FRIENDS HALL, GOOCH STREET, RECREATION GROUND TRUST

Charity number: 246233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £279 £305 £45 £50 £11
Total expenditure £85 £260 £3.48k £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A