Accounts and annual returns TALLOW CHANDLERS BENEVOLENT FUND NO 2

Charity number: 246255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2022 30 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 30 September 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 11 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 11 August 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 09 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 09 September 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 26 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 26 July 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 29 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 29 August 2018 On time Download Open in new window