Financial history TALLOW CHANDLERS BENEVOLENT FUND NO 2

Charity number: 246255
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022
Total gross income £662.84k £693.14k £902.18k £704.23k £1.03m
Total expenditure £468.64k £429.01k £819.16k £498.38k £1.06m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £310.05k £344.29k £572.62k £392.50k £705.31k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £351.84k £348.84k £329.56k £311.74k £325.50k
Income - Other £960 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £10.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £451.24k £385.96k £777.10k £466.17k £996.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £17.40k £43.05k £42.06k £32.21k £67.76k
Expenditure - Governance £900 £6.18k £5.76k £6.78k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £351.42k £285.62k £424.98k £410.32k £866.38k
Expenditure - Investment management £11.64k £0 £22.37k £12.69k £48.85k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0