CARERS UK

Charity number: 246329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.96m £3.33m £2.52m £4.01m £4.49m
Total expenditure £3.11m £3.09m £3.21m £3.61m £4.04m
Income from government contracts £285.00k N/A N/A £60.00k £126.00k
Income from government grants £97.50k £425.92k £523.39k £408.01k £818.56k
Income - Donations and legacies £3.09m £1.83m £879.42k £1.86m £2.06m
Income - Other trading activities £2.39k £768 £179 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.82m £1.47m £1.62m £2.10m £2.40m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £6 £1.30k £4.26k £4.61k £2.37k
Income - Other £40.58k £31.54k £23.23k £39.04k £21.01k
Income - Legacies £2.39m £1.12m £125.30k £484.14k £256.06k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.77m £2.76m £2.83m £3.28m £3.68m
Expenditure - Raising funds £338.60k £333.61k £384.01k £326.60k £352.49k
Expenditure - Governance £40.87k £35.49k £24.12k £35.00k £34.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £704 £820 £1.40k £0 £0