CARERS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To alleviate the conditions of life amongst people who are caring or who have cared for elderly, sick, disabled or otherwise infirm persons. To relieve and alleviate, and to promote, encourage and assist in the relief or alleviation of all kinds of mental and physical amongst carers and those persons for whom they are caring. To advance education concerning caring amongst carers and the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,644,094
Donations and legacies | £1.43m | |
Charitable activities | £3.07m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £89.55k | |
Other | £56.59k |
Total expenditure:
£4,965,208
Raising funds | £435.39k | |
Charitable activities | £4.53m | |
Other | £0 |
£48,116 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £574,871 from 3 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £435.39k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.53m |
People

66 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
400 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 February 1966: Standard registration
- 15 March 2024: Funds received from 1154735 UTTLESFORD CARERS
- ASSOCIATION OF CARERS (Working name)
- CARERS NORTHERN IRELAND (Working name)
- CARERS SCOTLAND (Working name)
- CARERS UK (Working name)
- CARERS WALES (Working name)
- CNA (Working name)
- NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR CARERS AND THEIR ELDERLY DEPENDANTS (Working name)
- CARERS NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- CARERS' NATIONAL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE NATIONAL COUNCIL FOR THE SINGLE WOMEN AND HER DEPENDANTS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Michael Granville Josephs | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martha C Woodward | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Hatter | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Somaya Akhtar | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Visala James | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Graham Faraday Baird CMG CVO | Trustee | 29 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr HELEN BROWN | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Margaret Patricia Dangoor | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Beverley Elizabeth Harden | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Flora Scott Martin | Trustee | 11 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Virginia Ann Pulbrook | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Siva Shan | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Eleanor Hester Bradley | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Tim Anfilogoff | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.01m | £4.49m | £4.93m | £4.96m | £4.64m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.61m | £4.04m | £4.70m | £4.99m | £4.97m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £60.00k | £126.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £408.01k | £818.56k | £719.92k | £746.66k | £574.87k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.86m | £2.06m | £1.56m | £1.03m | £1.43m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £1.83k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.10m | £2.40m | £3.35m | £3.90m | £3.07m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £4.61k | £2.37k | £1.90k | £10.97k | £89.55k | |
|
Income - Other | £39.04k | £21.01k | £16.85k | £21.08k | £56.59k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £484.14k | £256.06k | £156.04k | £358.22k | £130.57k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.28m | £3.68m | £4.23m | £4.46m | £4.53m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £326.60k | £352.49k | £467.12k | £487.16k | £435.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £35.00k | £34.43k | £34.59k | £35.52k | £64.40k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £40.42k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.39m | £1.32m | £1.25m | £1.18m | £1.11m | |
|
Long-term investments | £364.66k | £478.08k | £700.59k | £1.66m | £2.07m | |
|
Other assets | £3.37m | £4.54m | £5.97m | £4.11m | £2.40m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.66m | £2.30m | £3.62m | £2.69m | £1.59m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 NOVEMBER 1965, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 6 SEPTEMBER 1982, 4 MAY 1988, 22 SEPTEMBER 1993, 23 SEPTEMBER 1999, 8 NOVEMBER 2001, 9 NOVEMBER 2006 AND 8 NOVEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 NOV 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JUN 2017 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 11 JUL 2017 as amended on 14 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE: TO ALLEVIATE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE AMONGST PEOPLE WHO ARE CARING OR WHO HAVE CARED FOR OLDER, ILL, DISABLED, OR OTHERWISE INFIRM PERSONS (HEREINAFTER CALLED ‘CARERS’) AND WHO ARE IN, OR RISK FINDING THEMSELVES IN, NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, AND OF DEPENDANTS OF CARERS BEING DEPENDANTS WHO ARE THEMSELVES IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES, AND FOR THAT PURPOSE TO PROMOTE THE MATERIAL WELFARE OF SUCH CARERS. TO RELIEVE AND ALLEVIATE, AND TO ADVANCE, PROMOTE, ENCOURAGE AND ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OR ALLEVIATION OF ALL KINDS OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL INFIRMITY, SICKNESS, DISABLEMENT OR ILLNESS INCLUDING MENTAL ILLNESS ATTRIBUTABLE TO CARING, AMONGST CARERS AND THOSE PERSONS FOR WHOM THEY ARE CARING. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION CONCERNING CARING AMONGST CARERS AND THE PUBLIC. TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE FOR THE BENEFIT OF CARERS AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS TO THE EXTENT PERMITTED BY EACH OF THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES, SCOTLAND AND NORTHERN IRELAND AS APPLICABLE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
CARERS UK
20 GREAT DOVER STREET
LONDON
SE1 4LX
- Phone:
- 02073784945
- Email:
- info@carersuk.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window